Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Museums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0202)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0525)
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0942)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Industry
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0841)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0770)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Firemen's Heritage Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Piscataway Indian Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0351)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Peter Claver Museum of St. Inigoes, Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514 (SB1009)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Captain Avery Museum Window Repair and Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0192)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB1099)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Peter Claver Museum of St. Inigoes, Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0732)
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0200)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Peale Center for Baltimore History and Architecture
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 (HB0989)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Firemen's Heritage Museum
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0982)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB0848)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Industry
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 (HB1514)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Captain Avery Museum Window Repair and Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0192 (SB0202) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0260 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime Museum Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
HB0732 (SB0525) Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 (SB0942) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Industry Delegate McHale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0982 (SB0841) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0989 (SB0770) Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Firemen's Heritage Museum Delegate Wood 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB1095 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Piscataway Indian Museum Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB1099 (SB0351) Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Peter Claver Museum of St. Inigoes, Maryland Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB1514 (SB1009) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Captain Avery Museum Window Repair and Restoration Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
SB0051 Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0202 (HB0192) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0351 (HB1099) Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Peter Claver Museum of St. Inigoes, Maryland Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB0732) Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB0200) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - The Peale Center for Baltimore History and Architecture Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0770 (HB0989) Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Firemen's Heritage Museum Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB0982) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
SB0942 (HB0848) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Industry Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB1009 (HB1514) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Captain Avery Museum Window Repair and Restoration Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM