Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Museums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0331)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 6-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 (SB0339)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 4-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0333)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - ManneqART Museum and Maryland Fashion Institute Ho. Co. 5-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0470
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB1045)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Civil War Interpretive Center
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421 (SB1182)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Art
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1589 (SB1181)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1606
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Hosanna School Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1660 (SB0695)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0391)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 6-17
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0423)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - ManneqART Museum and Maryland Fashion Institute Ho. Co. 5-17
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0693 (HB0681)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB1660)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1045 (HB1088)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1179
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - McComas School Museum
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1181 (HB1589)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis Museum
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1182 (HB1421)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Art
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 (SB0331) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 6-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0421 (SB0339) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 4-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0423 (SB0333) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - ManneqART Museum and Maryland Fashion Institute Ho. Co. 5-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0470 Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 (SB1045) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
HB1125 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Civil War Interpretive Center Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB1131 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cylburn Arboretum Carriage House and Nature Museum Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
HB1421 (SB1182) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Art Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB1589 (SB1181) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis Museum Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB1606 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Hosanna School Museum Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB1660 (SB0695) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0391) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 6-17 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0333 (HB0423) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - ManneqART Museum and Maryland Fashion Institute Ho. Co. 5-17 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0592 /CH0693 (HB0681) Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB1660) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax Museum Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB1045 (HB1088) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's Museum Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB1067 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1179 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - McComas School Museum Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB1181 (HB1589) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis Museum Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1182 (HB1421) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Art Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM