Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Museums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 /CH0433 (SB0296/CH0434)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0255)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB1302)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 /CH0434 (HB0432/CH0433)
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0432 /CH0433 (SB0296/CH0434) Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 (SB0255) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1391 Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 (HB1302) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 /CH0434 (HB0432/CH0433) Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM