Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 (SB0753)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 (SB0196/CH0029)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658
Title
Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0645 (SB0170)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 /CH0646
Title
Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0332/CH0455)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 (HB0858/CH0645)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0029 (HB0626)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0204
Title
Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0455 (HB1328)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0437)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0168/CH0196) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Delegate Vitale 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0437 (SB0753) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0626 (SB0196/CH0029) Register of Wills - Salary Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0658 Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified Administration Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 /CH0645 (SB0170) Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0859 /CH0646 Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property Trusts Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1328 (SB0332/CH0455) Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0029 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based Accounts Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 /CH0196 (HB0008) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 (HB0858/CH0645) Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 /CH0029 (HB0626) Register of Wills - Salary Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0204 Estates and Trusts - Family Allowance Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0455 (HB1328) Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State Agencies Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0437) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM