Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0297 (SB0391/CH0296)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 (SB0621)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 /CH0435
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration - Objection
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0296 (HB0228/CH0297)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0570)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0228 /CH0297 (SB0391/CH0296) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0570 (SB0621) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0321/CH0291) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1004 /CH0435 Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration - Objection Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0321 /CH0291 (HB0656) Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0296 (HB0228/CH0297) Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Records Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 (HB0570) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM