Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Estates and Trusts (N2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 /CH0050 (SB0152/CH0051)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0130 (SB0149/CH0131)
Title
Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0702)
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 (SB0150)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons – Court–Appointed Attorneys
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0239 (SB0151/CH0240)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 /CH0616 (SB0507/CH0617)
Title
Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691 (SB0576/CH0568)
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 /CH0361 (SB0886/CH0362)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133 (SB0869)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0131 (HB0247/CH0130)
Title
Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 (HB0393)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 /CH0240 (HB0543/CH0239)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0051 (HB0094/CH0050)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0617 (HB0671/CH0616)
Title
Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 /CH0568 (HB0691)
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0320)
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1133)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 /CH0362 (HB0904/CH0361)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 /CH0050 (SB0152/CH0051) Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0247 /CH0130 (SB0149/CH0131) Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures Delegate Malone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 130
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0320 (SB0702) Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0339 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0393 (SB0150) Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0477 Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons – Court–Appointed Attorneys Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0543 /CH0239 (SB0151/CH0240) Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 239
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0671 /CH0616 (SB0507/CH0617) Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law Delegate Shetty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0691 (SB0576/CH0568) Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0904 /CH0361 (SB0886/CH0362) Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1133 (SB0869) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0149 /CH0131 (HB0247/CH0130) Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 131
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0150 (HB0393) Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0151 /CH0240 (HB0543/CH0239) Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 240
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0152 /CH0051 (HB0094/CH0050) Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 51
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0507 /CH0617 (HB0671/CH0616) Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0576 /CH0568 (HB0691) Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0702 (HB0320) Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1133) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0886 /CH0362 (HB0904/CH0361) Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:22 PM