Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Names

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0105
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale of Naming Rights to State Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Practice of Mortuary Science - Trade Names
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 /CH0105 Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 State Highway Administration - Sale of Naming Rights to State Highways Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1221 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Practice of Mortuary Science - Trade Names Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0805 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM