Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189
Title
Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0819)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0847)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0456)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0326)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB1312)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB1156)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB1184)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1156 (SB0819) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0847) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB0456) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1336 Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0333 (HB0326) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 (HB1312) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB1156) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 (HB1184) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM