Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0215
Title
Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0034)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 /CH0416
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0789)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0283)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB1350)
Title
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1009)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Maryland Kinesiology Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0080 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0149 /CH0215 Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0034) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0345 Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 /CH0416 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0789) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0283) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB1350) Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1009) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 Maryland Kinesiology Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM