Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 (SB0386)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0387)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 (SB0730)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0040)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0455)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1040)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0040 (SB0386) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0398 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0387) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0492 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0659 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1040 (SB0730) Wicomico County - Board of Education Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0026 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0232 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0040) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0455) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia Senator Zirkin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1040) Wicomico County - Board of Education Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM