Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0226
Title
Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945
Title
Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification Requirements
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0397)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1261)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809
Title
Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 /CH0226 Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification Requirements Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Delegate Anderson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1261 (SB0397) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 (HB1261) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM