Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0311)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0226)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0162
Title
Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0967)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0219 Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0311) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0311 (HB0226) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 /CH0162 Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0725 (HB0967) Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM