Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Carroll County Board of Education - Budget - Public Review
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046
Title
Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0528)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 /CH0098 (SB1010/CH0097)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0419
Title
Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0222)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0097 (HB1008/CH0098)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Carroll County Board of Education - Budget - Public Review Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0043 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0046 Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 (SB0528) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 /CH0098 (SB1010/CH0097) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 /CH0419 Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0222) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0097 (HB1008/CH0098) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM