Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0744
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892
Title
Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0399/CH0635)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0169
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638 (SB0788)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 /CH0635 (HB1185)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1638)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0815 /CH0744 Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical Cannabis Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0399/CH0635) Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 /CH0169 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 (SB0788) Public Information Act - Revisions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0399 /CH0635 (HB1185) Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB1638) Public Information Act - Revisions Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM