Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0041
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0324)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Election Law - Online Platforms - Anonymous Foreign Political Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Baltimore County – Broadcast of Record of Criminal Proceedings – Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 (SB0397)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Consumer Protection - News Analysis Programs - Disclaimer (Truthiness Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0009 /JR0001 (SJ0002/JR0002)
Title
Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0553)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1062)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492
Title
Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertising
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0009/JR0001)
Title
Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0167 Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 /CH0041 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0553 (SB0324) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
HB0711 Election Law - Online Platforms - Anonymous Foreign Political Communications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB0776 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 Baltimore County – Broadcast of Record of Criminal Proceedings – Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB1059 Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB1062 (SB0397) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1079 Consumer Protection - News Analysis Programs - Disclaimer (Truthiness Act of 2019) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1252 Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1307 Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0009 /JR0001 (SJ0002/JR0002) Freedom of the Press Day Delegate Cain 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0324 (HB0553) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 (HB1062) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Freedom of the Press Day Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0492 Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertising Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0009/JR0001) Freedom of the Press Day Senator Elfreth 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM