Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

News Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0305)
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0439)
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 (SB0112)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0535)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0632)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936
Title
Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0787)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 (HB0148)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296
Title
Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Environment - Public Hearing and Notification Modernization Act
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB0125)
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 (HB0593)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Election Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0079 (SB0305) Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0125 (SB0439) Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0148 (SB0112) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0593 (SB0535) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0701 Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 (SB0632) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1200 (SB0787) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0112 (HB0148) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0347 Environment - Public Hearing and Notification Modernization Act Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0439 (HB0125) Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0535 (HB0593) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0689 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0690 Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0787 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0831 Election Reform Act of 2021 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page