Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Noise

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0331)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514 /CH0421
Title
Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0237)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0237 (SB0331) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 /CH0421 Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0237) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page