Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Noise

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0154 (SB0072/CH0153)
Title
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0153 (HB0233/CH0154)
Title
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752
Title
State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along Highways
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 /CH0154 (SB0072/CH0153) Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0072 /CH0153 (HB0233/CH0154) Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 Juvenile Law - Citations for Violations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0752 State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along Highways Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM