Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Noise

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0184)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0209)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 (HB0310)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0654)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622)
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0310 (SB0184) University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0654 (SB0209) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1212 Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1493 /CH0622 (SB0878/CH0623) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Delegate Hartman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0184 (HB0310) University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0209 (HB0654) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 /CH0623 (HB1493/CH0622) Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 5:52 PM