Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Noise

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0408)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0849)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB1180)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 (SB0408) Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0198 Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0254 University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1180 (SB0849) Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0408 (HB0178) Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB1180) Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page