Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nonresidents -see also- Aliens and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Department of State Police - Police Employees - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734 (SB0808)
Title
University System of Maryland - Institution Management - Admissions Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Transportation Services - Preference for In-State Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0554)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1291)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619
Title
Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0734)
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Institution Management - Admissions Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0678 Department of State Police - Police Employees - Residency Requirements Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0734 (SB0808) University System of Maryland - Institution Management - Admissions Requirements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1289 Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Transportation Services - Preference for In-State Contractors Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0554) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1291) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013 Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0734) Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Institution Management - Admissions Requirements Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM