Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nonresidents -see also- Aliens and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
Public Safety - Assault Weapons and Detachable Magazines - Possession or Transport by Nonresident
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0602
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 (SB0437)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 (SB0974)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through State
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Dwelling House of Disabled Veteran or Surviving Spouse - Repeal of Domicile Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0618)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974 (HB0659)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through State
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1110
Title
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Copper Wire
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 Public Safety - Assault Weapons and Detachable Magazines - Possession or Transport by Nonresident Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 /CH0602 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 (SB0437) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0659 (SB0974) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through State Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 Property Tax Exemption - Dwelling House of Disabled Veteran or Surviving Spouse - Repeal of Domicile Requirements Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0437 (HB0618) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0974 (HB0659) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through State Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1110 Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Copper Wire Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM