Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nonresidents -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0426/CH0171)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0069/CH0005)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0260
Title
Natural Resources - Nonresident Senior and Junior Hunting Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0617 /CH0264
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms and Ammunition - Transport Through State
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 /CH0279
Title
Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal Law
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 /CH0341 (SB0335/CH0340)
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident Cardholders
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074 /CH0295
Title
Complimentary Hunting License for Former Prisoners of War or Disabled Veterans - Reciprocity
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0005 (HB0181)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742)
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0340 (HB0847/CH0341)
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0171 (HB0090)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial Aid
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0090 (SB0426/CH0171) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0181 (SB0069/CH0005) State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement Delegate Hill 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0554 /CH0260 Natural Resources - Nonresident Senior and Junior Hunting Licenses Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0617 /CH0264 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - Authorization Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 Public Safety - Regulated Firearms and Ammunition - Transport Through State Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 /CH0279 Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal Law Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0847 /CH0341 (SB0335/CH0340) Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1068 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident Cardholders Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1074 /CH0295 Complimentary Hunting License for Former Prisoners of War or Disabled Veterans - Reciprocity Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0005 (HB0181) State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742) State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 /CH0340 (HB0847/CH0341) Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0426 /CH0171 (HB0090) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0843 University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial Aid Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM