Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nonresidents -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0616
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734
Title
State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Lawyers - Admission to the Bar - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 /CH0310
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Complimentary Licenses - Military and Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0151
Title
State Government - Web Sites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0062
Title
State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208)
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0616 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex Offenders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0616 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0734 State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 Lawyers - Admission to the Bar - Qualifications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1223 Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 /CH0310 Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Hunting and Fishing - Complimentary Licenses - Military and Veterans Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0028 /CH0151 State Government - Web Sites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0062 State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0207 (HB0554/CH0208) Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM