Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0190/CH0450)
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0450 (HB0448)
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0448 (SB0190/CH0450) State Government - Notary Public - Appointment Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0190 /CH0450 (HB0448) State Government - Notary Public - Appointment Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM