Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899 (SB0114)
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB0280)
Title
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0899)
Title
Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0985)
Title
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0899 (SB0114) Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0985 (SB0280) Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 (HB0899) Harford County - Board of License Commissioners - Temporary License Application Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0247 State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0280 (HB0985) Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page