Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nuclear Matters -see also- Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0265)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 (SB0890)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0739)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0363)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1426)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB1349)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006
Title
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0363 (SB0265) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 (SB0890) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 (SB0739) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 (HB0363) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 (HB1426) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0890 (HB1349) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 8:51 PM