Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0583
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or Video
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0583 Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties Charles County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or Video Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM