Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0206)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Juveniles – Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0385)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005
Title
Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Sexual Behavior
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 (SB0405)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Revocation of Local Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registration - Indecent Exposure by Inmate
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 (HB0242)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 (HB1287)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Nudity and Sexual Displays
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515
Title
Crimes – Indecent Exposure – Definition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0211 Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 (SB0206) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0272 Juveniles – Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 (SB0385) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1005 Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Sexual Behavior Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1287 (SB0405) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Revocation of Local Licenses Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1348 Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registration - Indecent Exposure by Inmate Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 (HB0242) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0405 (HB1287) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Nudity and Sexual Displays Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 Crimes – Indecent Exposure – Definition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:08 PM