Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0019/CH0164)
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0331)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0163)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0320)
Title
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 /CH0690
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0164 (HB0012)
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 (HB0241)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0402)
Title
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0237)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance Suits
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0019/CH0164) Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0237 (SB0331) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 (SB0163) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0402 (SB0320) Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1222 Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions Delegate Weir 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 /CH0690 St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0164 (HB0012) Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 (HB0241) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 (HB0402) Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic Cannabinoids Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0237) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0985 Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance Suits Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM