Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 (SB1010)
Title
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1473)
Title
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance Actions Delegate Weir 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1473 (SB1010) Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0947 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1010 (HB1473) Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM