Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" Laws
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0496 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" Laws Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM