Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Land Use – Public Nuisance – Surety Bond Requirement (Developer Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Baltimore City Charter Amendment - Public Nuisances - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 (SB0493)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Local Government - Overhead Transmission Lines - Property Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0472)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0234 Land Use – Public Nuisance – Surety Bond Requirement (Developer Accountability Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Baltimore City Charter Amendment - Public Nuisances - Notice Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0472 (SB0493) Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1219 Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Local Government - Overhead Transmission Lines - Property Maintenance Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0472) Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM