Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Real Property - Nuisance Abatement - Penalties for Owners of Commercial Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 /CH0442
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Criminal Law - Neighborhood Nuisance - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0217 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0558 Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Real Property - Nuisance Abatement - Penalties for Owners of Commercial Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 /CH0442 Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0366 Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0692 Criminal Law - Neighborhood Nuisance - Civil Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM