Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 (SB0247)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0209)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0582)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408 (SB0929)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0528
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0654)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 (HB0511)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0877)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1408)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0511 (SB0247) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0654 (SB0209) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0821 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 (SB0582) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1408 (SB0929) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0114 /CH0528 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0654) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 (HB0511) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0340 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0491 Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB0877) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Program and Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0929 (HB1408) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Senator Hayes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:48 PM