Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Nurse Practitioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0056)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Council Membership, Formulary Content, and Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537 (SB0398)
Title
Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0826)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0393)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0891)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 (SB0102)
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0191)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 (HB1252)
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0551)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 (HB0537)
Title
Mental Health Law - Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0538)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1112)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 (SB0056) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0219 Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Council Membership, Formulary Content, and Scope of Practice Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0537 (SB0398) Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Procedures Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0538 (SB0826) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0551 (SB0393) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0774 Public Health – Adverse Childhood Experience Screening – Requirement and Practitioner Training Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0903 Task Force to Study the Maryland Public Guardianship Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1112 (SB0891) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB1252 (SB0102) Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0056 (HB0191) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0102 (HB1252) Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0393 (HB0551) Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 (HB0537) Mental Health Law - Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Procedures Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB0538) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1112) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page