Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nurses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622 /CH0386 (SB0161/CH0385)
Title
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0862)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 /CH0528 (SB1114/CH0529)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0656
Title
State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0385 (HB0622/CH0386)
Title
Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490)
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476
Title
Dispensing of Naloxone - Hospital Emergency Departments - Registered Nurses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0863/CH0483)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1114 /CH0529 (HB1437/CH0528)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441) Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0569 Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 /CH0386 (SB0161/CH0385) Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698) State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 (SB0862) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1289 Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1437 /CH0528 (SB1114/CH0529) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0008 /CH0656 State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 /CH0385 (HB0622/CH0386) Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490) Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 Dispensing of Naloxone - Hospital Emergency Departments - Registered Nurses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0698 (HB0863/CH0483) State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 (HB0909) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB1114 /CH0529 (HB1437/CH0528) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM