Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nursing Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB0639/CH0572)
Title
Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1564 /CH0488
Title
Public Health - Emergency Evaluations - Duties of Peace Officers and Emergency Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1525 (SB0639/CH0572) Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1564 /CH0488 Public Health - Emergency Evaluations - Duties of Peace Officers and Emergency Facilities Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0449 Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:42 PM