Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100 /CH0381
Title
Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271 (SB0276)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0413
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0732)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0890)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0271)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0784)
Title
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB1266)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0100 /CH0381 Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0271 (SB0276) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 /CH0413 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Delegate Cullison 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 (SB0732) Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1072 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0890) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0013 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0276 (HB0271) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0732 (HB0784) Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness Equipment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 (HB1266) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM