Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0059 (SB0059)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0091)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0068/CH0059)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0282)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795
Title
Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0068 /CH0059 (SB0059) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0282 (SB0091) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0059 (HB0068/CH0059) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0282) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM