Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0109
Title
Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 (SB0418)
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0454)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends House
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1599 (SB1109)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Nursing Homes - Lifting of Immobile Patients - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0411)
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0546)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends House
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 (HB1599)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 /CH0109 Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0411 (SB0418) State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 (SB0454) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends House Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB1599 (SB1109) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1647 Nursing Homes - Lifting of Immobile Patients - Requirements Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0411) State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 (HB0546) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends House Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1109 (HB1599) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM