Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 (SB0239)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440)
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 /CH0503
Title
Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0473
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 (HB0258)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Nursing Homes - Provision of Beds With Bed Rails
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 /CH0454
Title
Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923
Title
Maryland All-Payer Model Agreement - Medicare Skilled Nursing Facility 3-Day Rule - Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 (SB0239) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB0375 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440) Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1130 /CH0503 Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 /CH0445 (SB0630) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0004 /CH0473 Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0016 Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 (HB0258) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0325 Nursing Homes - Provision of Beds With Bed Rails Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 /CH0454 Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018 Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0630 (HB1215/CH0445) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0923 Maryland All-Payer Model Agreement - Medicare Skilled Nursing Facility 3-Day Rule - Waiver Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM