Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0502
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0399
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892)
Title
Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0784)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1323)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0316 /CH0502 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0399 Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892) Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1323 (SB0784) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1323) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187) Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM