Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0084
Title
Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0215
Title
Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0427 (SB0795)
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 /CH0621
Title
Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0796/CH0341)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB0813/CH0427)
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 /CH0341 (HB1036)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105
Title
Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 /CH0084 Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0149 /CH0215 Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term Limits Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0813 /CH0427 (SB0795) Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 /CH0621 Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0796/CH0341) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB0813/CH0427) Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0796 /CH0341 (HB1036) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1105 Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM