Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Homeless Expenditures Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0422
Title
Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0460
Title
Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and Models
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0388
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0387
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0444 Homeless Expenditures Accountability Act Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0460 /CH0422 Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0852 /CH0460 Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and Models Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 2-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or Hotline Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0388 Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Health and Government Operations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0387 Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM