Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0718
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefits - Grant Application
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 /CH0332 (SB0022/CH0331)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Additions and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 /CH0079 (SB0785/CH0078)
Title
Foster Youth Summer Internship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0894)
Title
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 (SB0920)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500
Title
Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Safety and Security Measures
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502 /CH0312
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0331 (HB0593/CH0332)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 /CH0078 (HB1162/CH0079)
Title
Foster Youth Summer Internship Program
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB1190)
Title
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - Study
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 (HB1482)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 /CH0718 Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefits - Grant Application Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 /CH0332 (SB0022/CH0331) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Additions and Extension Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 /CH0079 (SB0785/CH0078) Foster Youth Summer Internship Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0894) Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload Analysis Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 (SB0920) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1500 Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Safety and Security Measures Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1502 /CH0312 Child Support Enforcement - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 /CH0331 (HB0593/CH0332) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 /CH0078 (HB1162/CH0079) Foster Youth Summer Internship Program Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB1190) Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - Study Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 (HB1482) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM