Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Services - Generally (O1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 /CH0148 (SB0367)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878
Title
Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB1024)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0662)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0973)
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsor
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363 /CH0460
Title
Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 (SB0833)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532
Title
Human Services – Food Supplement Program – Eligibility (Protect Against Hunger Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0508
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0277/CH0148)
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0559)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0986)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1527)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 (HB1031)
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsor
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 (HB0938)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0277 /CH0148 (SB0367) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 148
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0698 Food Supplement Employment and Training Program - Benefits and Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program - Established Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0878 Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0938 (SB1024) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0986 (SB0662) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1031 (SB0973) Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1363 /CH0460 Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission Delegate McKay 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1527 (SB0833) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1532 Human Services – Food Supplement Program – Eligibility (Protect Against Hunger Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0508 Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Finance
1/09/2020 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
SB0367 (HB0277/CH0148) State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0559) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator McCray 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0662 (HB0986) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0833 (HB1527) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0973 (HB1031) Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness 6 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1024 (HB0938) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:59 PM