Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 (SB0805)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 (SB0604)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0017
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0978)
Title
Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0262)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 /CH0468
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0262 (SB0805) Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 (SB0604) Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0017 Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0978) Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0262) Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration Senator Pugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1109 /CH0468 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page