Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0425)
Title
Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0473
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409
Title
Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB0344)
Title
Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0344 (SB0425) Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0375 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 /CH0473 Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0409 Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0425 (HB0344) Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM