Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0670)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0279 (SB0444/CH0280)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 (SB0480)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423
Title
Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0280 (HB0631/CH0279)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0707)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0564)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0498 Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding Delegate Hill 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0564 (SB0670) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0631 /CH0279 (SB0444/CH0280) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0707 (SB0480) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1423 Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0444 /CH0280 (HB0631/CH0279) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0480 (HB0707) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0670 (HB0564) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:14 PM